Vedic Maths makes mathematics as magic. Watch this video explained by VSR to realize that. Learn maths with smile.

## 27 thoughts on “Vedic Maths – be human calculators-magical multiplication”

### Leave a Reply

You must be logged in to post a comment.

Vedic Maths makes mathematics as magic. Watch this video explained by VSR to realize that. Learn maths with smile.

You must be logged in to post a comment.

does nt work for 123*9

what with 16 and 2

wow its crazy. india is again rocks

very nice

sir wat abt multiplying a number whose digits are greater than d number of 9′s digit?? lik 1234 x 999….. i suppose we shud subtract the negative number from d last 4th digit…?

Here is the best book on vedic maths, free of cost, just to benefit you people.

sir

does it work if last number is 0

sir, first of all let me thank u for opening a new world of mathematics to me.till yesterday maths was a nightmare to me ,but ur method for doing all in a simple way gave me courage to face any type of multiplication .once more thank u sir thank u

Superb sir.

AMAZING INDIAN VEDIC MATHEMATICS

works for small numbers, i do this many times and not for just nine either. do the same for or 7 too, but when you encounter very large numbers, its either a calc or the trick.

wow excellent sir so easy techniques

Hey! I think I saw you in the movie ‘shortcircut!’

68 X60 BUT ACTUALLY IT IS 4080 MAY BE ANOTHER METHOD /????

6700

Listen again. He said this trick only works when mulitplying by 9.

what if 678×99

the answer would come negative

3×8 dont work

why lie

NIce…

what about 907 x 338?

Vande Mataram!

We should promote vadic culture and sanskrit !

i love you man. . . . . .you’re the man, I’m filipino. i highly appreciate it…MAY GOD WATCH OVER YOU, IM SO HAPPY UPON READING THIS TACTICS

I think it’s easier if you have, x * 9

change the 9 to a ten, so you get, x + 10

then just subtract x, x * 10 – x

this way, it still works if x > 9.

You get the correct answer.

9-2=7 9-6=3

thanks alot you rockk this is all on 9

How to solve when the no. Of 9′s are less than the multiplicative digits…

This is video very good!thanks!

When yo have more 9′s than the number of digits in the first number [your example 52] you just copy those extra nine’s to the result before starting to do the subtraction from 9′s.

Examples;

52*999 -> 51 [52-1] 9 [one extra 9] 48 [99-51] so the result is => 51948

52*9999 -> 51 [52-1] 99 [two extra 9] 48 [99-51] so the result is => 519948

52*99999 -> 51 [52-1] 999 [three extra 9] 48 [99-51] so the result is => 5199948